PA HB365 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, providing for removal of persons from residential property.
Title
In burglary and other criminal intrusion, providing for removal of persons from residential property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Floor: HB 365 PN 2490, FP (Y: 155 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 365 PN 335, 2019 A1715, WHITE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Floor: HB 365 PN 2490, FP (Y: 155 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 365 PN 335, 2019 A1715, WHITE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-09-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-09-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (155-44) |
2019-09-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |