PA HB37 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for learners' permits and for examination of applicant for driver's license; in rules of the road in general, repealing provisions relating to prohibiting text-based communications, prohibiting use of interactive wireless communications devices and imposing penalties; and, in operation of vehicles miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of homicide by vehicle and for the offense of aggravated assault by vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for learners' permits and for examination of applicant for driver's license; in rules of the road in general, repealing provisions relating to prohibiting text-based communications, prohibiting use of interactive wireless communications devices and imposing penalties; and, in operation of vehicles miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of homicide by vehicle and for the offense of aggravated assault by vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 37 PN 3136, FP (Y: 120 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 37 PN 2058, 2019 A3274, HEFFLEY (Y: 117 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 37 PN 2058, 2019 A3273, BROWN (Y: 180 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01752 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2020-01-15SenateIn the Senate
2020-01-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (120-74)
2020-01-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-14HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-12-09HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-10HouseReported as amended
2019-02-05HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=37
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0037&pn=0356
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0037&pn=2058
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0037&pn=3136
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=689
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1031
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1055
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/15/2020&RollCallId=1620

Bill Comments

feedback