PA HB370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act No. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 30, 1981 (P.L.128, No.43), known as the Agricultural Area Security Law, further providing for purchase of agricultural conservation easements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for purchase of agricultural conservation easements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 370 PN 360, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 370 PN 360, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct No. 33
2019-07-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-26SenateSigned in House
2019-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-04SenateReported as committed
2019-03-28SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2019-03-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2019-03-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-20HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-20HouseReported as committed
2019-02-05HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2019-02-05HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 360
2019-02-04HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=370
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0370&pn=0338
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0370&pn=0360
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=02/20/2019&RollCallId=34
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=86
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/18/2019&RollCallId=133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=368
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=205

Bill Comments

feedback