PA HB374 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for power to convey.
Title
Amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for power to convey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - HB 374 PN 713, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - HB 374 PN 713, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - HB 374 PN 713, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 13 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-03-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-03-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-03-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-03-01 | House | Second consideration |
2011-02-16 | House | Removed from table |
2011-02-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-02-15 | House | First consideration |
2011-02-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-01 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |