PA HB374 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for jurisdiction, education and educational costs of county park police officers.
Title
Further providing for jurisdiction, education and educational costs of county park police officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Krieger [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. George Dunbar [R] | Rep. Eli Evankovich [R] |
Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. Thomas Murt [R] | Rep. Michael Reese [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 374 PN 386, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 374 PN 386, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Act No. 18 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-03-11 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-03-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Signed in House |
2014-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-02-04 | House | In the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2013-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-19 | House | Second consideration |
2013-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |