PA HB386 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for a tax credit program to support community-based mental retardation services in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for a tax credit program to support community-based mental retardation services in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2012-05-23 | House | Re-referred to FINANCE |
2012-05-23 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to FINANCE |
2011-02-01 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |