PA HB394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in vocational education, providing for a workforce development program clearinghouse.
Title
In vocational education, providing for a workforce development program clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 394 PN 859, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00151 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 394 PN 859, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00151 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-03-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |