PA HB404 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in controlled plants and noxious weeds, further providing for noxious weed list.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In controlled plants and noxious weeds, further providing for noxious weed list.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 404 PN 380, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateLaid on the table
2019-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-04SenateReported as committed
2019-03-28SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2019-03-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2019-03-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-20HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-20HouseReported as committed
2019-02-06HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=404
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0404&pn=0380
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=02/20/2019&RollCallId=35
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=91
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/18/2019&RollCallId=134
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=204

Bill Comments

feedback