PA HB410 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.
Title
In public assistance, providing for compensable services and items; and abrogating a related regulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Oberlander [R] | Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Michael Sturla [D] |
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Joanna McClinton [D] | Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 410 PN 385, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-22 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-11-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to HEALTH |