PA HB421 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Act No. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating the Arch Street Bridge on State Route 2064, Lycoming County, as the Duboistown Bridge.
Title
Designating the Arch Street Bridge on State Route 2064, Lycoming County, as the Duboistown Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - Senate - HB 421 PN 465, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - House - HB 421 PN 465, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - House - HB 421 PN 465, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Act No. 16 | |
2010-03-29 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-22 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-03-22 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-03-17 | Signed in House | |
2010-03-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-08 | Removed from table | |
2009-06-30 | Laid on the table | |
2009-06-16 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-24 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-04-21 | In the Senate | |
2009-04-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-04-20 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-01 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-31 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-31 | First consideration | |
2009-03-31 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |