PA HB421 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Passed on October 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-23 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in contributions, further providing for establishment and maintenance of employer's reserve accounts, for relief from charges and for reciprocal agreements; in compensation, further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation and for ineligibility for compensation; in penalties, further providing for false statements and representations to obtain or increase compensation and for recovery and recoupment of compensation; and, in shared-work program, further providing for definitions, for application to approve shared-work plan, for shared-work plan requirements and for expiration.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in contributions, further providing for establishment and maintenance of employer's reserve accounts, for relief from charges and for reciprocal agreements; in compensation, further providing for qualifications required to secure compensation and for ineligibility for compensation; in penalties, further providing for false statements and representations to obtain or increase compensation and for recovery and recoupment of compensation; and, in shared-work program, further providing for definitions, for application to approve shared-work plan, for shared-work plan requirements and for expiration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-22 - House - HB 421 PN 2415, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-21 - Senate - HB 421 PN 2415, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - HB 421 PN 1125, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-10-21 - Senate - HB 421 PN 2415, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - HB 421 PN 1125, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-23 | House | Act No. 75 |
2013-10-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-10-22 | House | Signed in House |
2013-10-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (202-0) |
2013-10-22 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2013-10-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2013-10-21 | House | In the House |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2013-03-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-18 | House | Second consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |