PA HB421 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-13)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions.
Title
In senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-30 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-21 | House | Removed from table |
2015-07-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-22 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to FINANCE |