PA HB422 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for training of inspectors.
Title
In training and certification of inspectors, further providing for training of inspectors.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheryl Delozier [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. Mark Keller [R] | Rep. Thomas Murt [R] |
Rep. Justin Simmons [R] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Rep. Daniel Deasy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 422 PN 1088, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 422 PN 1088, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2019-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-1) |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-25 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |