PA HB423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in general provisions applying to both liquor and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for local option.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions applying to both liquor and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for local option.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 423 PN 2175, CONCUR (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 423 PN 2175, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 423 PN 1327, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00661 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseAct No. 48
2019-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-28HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-28HouseSigned in House
2019-06-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (198-1)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-27HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-27HouseIn the House
2019-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as amended
2019-05-17SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-05-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-05-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-07HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-06HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-08HouseReported as amended
2019-02-11HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=423
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0423&pn=0412
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0423&pn=1327
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0423&pn=2175
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=225
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=292
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/08/2019&RollCallId=482
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=416
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=242
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=996
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=630

Bill Comments

feedback