PA HB425 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for school-to-work programs; establishing the CareerBound program; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Labor and Industry.
Title
Providing for school-to-work programs; establishing the CareerBound program; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Labor and Industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 425 PN 882, FP (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00156 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 425 PN 882, FP (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00156 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2019-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-1) |
2019-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |