PA HB427 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for health insurance coverage requirements for stage four, advanced metastatic cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for health insurance coverage requirements for stage four, advanced metastatic cancer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 427 PN 2194, FP (Y: 196 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 427 PN 1089, 2019 A2230, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 190 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00422 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2019-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-3)
2019-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-25HouseReported as amended
2019-02-11HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=427
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0427&pn=0414
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0427&pn=1089
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0427&pn=2194
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=176
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=512
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=895

Bill Comments

feedback