PA HB432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-27)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in interpretation and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in liability and compensation, further providing for compensation for post-traumatic stress injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In interpretation and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in liability and compensation, further providing for compensation for post-traumatic stress injury.

Sponsors

Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D]Rep. Kevin Boyle [D]
Rep. Frank Burns [D]Rep. Carolyn Comitta [D]Rep. Margo Davidson [D]Rep. Austin Davis [D]
Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Daniel Deasy [D]Rep. David Delloso [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]
Rep. Frank Dermody [D]Rep. Gene DiGirolamo [R]Rep. Maria Donatucci [D]Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]
Rep. Torren Ecker [R]Rep. Frank Farry [R]Rep. Isabella Fitzgerald [D]Rep. Dan Frankel [D]
Rep. Edward Gainey [D]Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R]Rep. Patrick Harkins [D]Rep. Jordan Harris [D]
Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D]Rep. Sara Innamorato [D]Rep. Mary Isaacson [D]Rep. William Kortz [D]
Rep. Anita Kulik [D]Rep. Maureen Madden [D]Rep. Brandon Markosek [D]Rep. James Marshall [R]
Rep. Robert Matzie [D]Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D]Rep. Robert Merski [D]Rep. Daniel Miller [D]
Rep. Kyle Mullins [D]Rep. Thomas Murt [R]Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Jennifer O'Mara [D]
Rep. Todd Polinchock [R]Rep. Adam Ravenstahl [D]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]
Rep. Christina Sappey [D]Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]Rep. Pam Snyder [D]
Rep. Jared Solomon [D]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Perry Warren [D]Rep. Martina White [R]
Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Michael Zabel [D]Rep. Martin Flynn [D]Rep. Wendy Ullman [D]
Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]Rep. Joseph Hohenstein [D]Rep. Leanne Krueger-Braneky [D]Rep. Malcolm Kenyatta [D]
Rep. Matthew Gabler [R]Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D]Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D]Rep. Scott Conklin [D]
Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. Jack Rader [R]Rep. Thomas Mehaffie [R]
Rep. Joseph Webster [D]Rep. Todd Stephens [R]Rep. Tarah Toohil [R]Rep. Stephen McCarter [D]
Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]Rep. Natalie Mihalek [R]Rep. James Rigby [R]Rep. Danielle Otten [D]
Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]Rep. Justin Walsh [R]Rep. James Struzzi [R]
Rep. Jake Wheatley [D]Rep. Neal Goodman [D]Rep. Wendi Thomas [R]Rep. Dan Williams [D]
Rep. Christopher Quinn [R]Rep. Michael Sturla [D]Rep. Brian Kirkland [D]Rep. Stephen Samuelson [D]

Roll Calls

2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02901 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-24HouseReported as amended
2019-02-11HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback