PA HB433 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for disposition of founded and indicated reports, for amendment or expunction of information, for investigation of reports; and for evidence in court proceedings.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for disposition of founded and indicated reports, for amendment or expunction of information, for investigation of reports; and for evidence in court proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - HB 433 PN 2008, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - HB 433 PN 2008, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |