PA HB437 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-08 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-08 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for the definition of "building machinery and equipment."
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for the definition of "building machinery and equipment."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-02 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-12 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to FINANCE |