PA HB437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child custody, further providing for award of custody.
Title
In child custody, further providing for award of custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 437 PN 3194, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04510 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04510 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-04-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-21 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-01-13 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3122 |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |