PA HB448 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-10)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on February 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 7, 1901 (P.L.20, No.14), referred to as the Second Class City Law, further providing for penalty for false personification.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 7, 1901 (P.L.20, No.14), referred to as the Second Class City Law, further providing for penalty for false personification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-04-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-30 | Removed from table | |
2007-03-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-03-19 | First consideration | |
2007-03-19 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-26 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=448 |