PA HB448 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 12, 2018 (P.L.136, No.28), known as the Pennsylvania Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial Act, further providing for definitions, for establishment, for composition and for report to the Governor and the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for establishment, for composition and for report to the Governor and the General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 448 PN 2181, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 448 PN 2181, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 448 PN 2105, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 448 PN 433, 2019 A1742, KAUFER (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseAct No. 49
2019-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-26HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-25HouseSigned in House
2019-06-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2019-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-24HouseIn the House
2019-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-1)
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as amended
2019-06-14SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as committed
2019-02-11HouseReferred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=448
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0448&pn=0433
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0448&pn=2105
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0448&pn=2181
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=547
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=384
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=426
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=768
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=352
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=166
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=922
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=572

Bill Comments

feedback