PA HB471 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Re-referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Re-referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in health and accident insurance, prohibiting exclusions for preexisting conditions and providing for coverage for General Assembly.
Title
In health and accident insurance, prohibiting exclusions for preexisting conditions and providing for coverage for General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05217 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05217 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | Re-referred to HEALTH |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as amended with request to re-refer to Health |
2020-01-14 | House | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |