PA HB474 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for definitions, for aggravated assault and for criminal trespass.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for aggravated assault and for criminal trespass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - HB 474 PN 1579, FP (Y: 190 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - HB 474 PN 1579, 2013 A1253, BROWNLEE (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - HB 474 PN 1579, 2013 A1253, BROWNLEE (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-7) |
2013-05-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2013-04-24 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-23 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |