PA HB494 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.216, No.76), known as The Dental Law, further providing for State Board of Dentistry.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.216, No.76), known as The Dental Law, further providing for State Board of Dentistry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2008-02-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-02-06 | Second consideration | |
2008-02-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-12-13 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-13 | Removed from table | |
2007-12-12 | Laid on the table | |
2007-12-12 | First consideration | |
2007-12-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-26 | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=494 |