PA HB503 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in depositions and witnesses, providing for procedures to protect victims and witnesses with intellectual disabilities or autism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In depositions and witnesses, providing for procedures to protect victims and witnesses with intellectual disabilities or autism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 503 PN 862, FP (Y: 186 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor: HB 503 PN 491, 2019 A112, D. MILLER (Y: 86 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor: HB 503 PN 491, 2019 A61, KAUFFMAN (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (186-11)
2019-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-02-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-21HouseReported as committed
2019-02-12HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=503
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0503&pn=0491
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0503&pn=0862
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=46
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=57
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=58
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=162
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=256

Bill Comments

feedback