PA HB504 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.789, No.285), known as The Insurance Department Act of 1921, in insurance producers, further providing for definitions and providing for self-service storage insurance.
Title
In insurance producers, further providing for definitions and providing for self-service storage insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 504 PN 3297, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 3297, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A06211 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A06265 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 3297, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A06211 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A06265 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 97 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-16 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |