PA HB504 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, further providing for evidence of victim's sexual conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sexual offenses, further providing for evidence of victim's sexual conduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 504 PN 492, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 492, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct No. 24
2019-06-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-20SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-19SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-19SenateSigned in House
2019-06-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as committed
2019-04-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-11HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-21HouseReported as committed
2019-02-12HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=504
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0504&pn=0492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=47
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=163
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=257
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=265
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=161

Bill Comments

feedback