PA HB505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in depositions and witnesses, further providing for admissibility of certain statements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In depositions and witnesses, further providing for admissibility of certain statements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 505 PN 493, FP (Y: 193 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-4)
2019-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-11HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-21HouseReported as committed
2019-02-12HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback