PA HB510 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in intergovernmental cooperation, further providing for ordinance, for content of ordinance, for joint purchases with private educational establishments, for required review of specified agreements and for effect of joint cooperation agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In intergovernmental cooperation, further providing for ordinance, for content of ordinance, for joint purchases with private educational establishments, for required review of specified agreements and for effect of joint cooperation agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 510 PN 885, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 510 PN 885, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00118 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07SenateAct No. 80
2019-11-07SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-10-29SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-10-29SenateSigned in Senate
2019-10-29SenateSigned in House
2019-10-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-09-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04SenateSecond consideration
2019-04-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-30SenateReported as committed
2019-03-29SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-03-25SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-03-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-13HouseReported as amended
2019-02-12HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=510
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0510&pn=0496
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0510&pn=0885
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=113
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=196
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=122
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/23/2019&RollCallId=499
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=301

Bill Comments

feedback