PA HB511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in corporate powers, further providing for intergovernmental cooperation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In corporate powers, further providing for intergovernmental cooperation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 511 PN 497, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 511 PN 497, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07SenateAct No. 81
2019-11-07SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-10-29SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-10-29SenateSigned in Senate
2019-10-29SenateSigned in House
2019-10-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-09-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04SenateSecond consideration
2019-04-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-30SenateReported as committed
2019-03-29SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-03-25SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-03-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-13HouseReported as committed
2019-02-12HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=511
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0511&pn=0497
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=115
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=121
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=197
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=123
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/23/2019&RollCallId=500
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=302

Bill Comments

feedback