PA HB518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 15, 1986 (P.L.1585, No.174), known as the Private Licensed Schools Act, further providing for definitions and for license fees; and providing for multibranch training schools.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for license fees; and providing for multibranch training schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Floor: HB 518 PN 2489, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 518 PN 1488, 2019 A1668, ORTITAY (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00505 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Floor: HB 518 PN 2489, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 518 PN 1488, 2019 A1668, ORTITAY (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00505 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-09-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-09-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-09-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |