PA HB523 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for trademark counterfeiting; prohibiting the sale of food, nonprescription drugs and cosmetics under certain circumstances; and imposing penalties.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for trademark counterfeiting; prohibiting the sale of food, nonprescription drugs and cosmetics under certain circumstances; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-13 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2007-10-31 | Final passage | |
2007-10-29 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2007-10-24 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-10-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-17 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-16 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-16 | First consideration | |
2007-10-16 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-06 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=523 |