PA HB523 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-27 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-27 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, further providing for verification of eligibility.
Title
Further providing for verification of eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-23 - House - HB 523 PN 1127, FP (Y: 142 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - HB 523 PN 566, 2013 A302, STURLA (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - HB 523 PN 566, 2013 A302, STURLA (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2013-09-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-09-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (142-56) |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | Removed from table |
2013-02-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-02-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to HEALTH |