PA HB523 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1836 (P.L.551, No.169), referred to as the General Road Law, further providing for repair of private roads.
Title
Further providing for repair of private roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 523 PN 2576, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02886 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 523 PN 2576, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02886 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-1) |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |