PA HB547 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, in corporate powers, further providing for ordinances and resolutions; and, in finance and taxation, further providing for tax levies and for tax rates to be expressed in dollars and cents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In corporate powers, further providing for ordinances and resolutions; and, in finance and taxation, further providing for tax levies and for tax rates to be expressed in dollars and cents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 547 PN 886, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor: HB 547 PN 886, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00275 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00176 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00101 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02SenateAct No. 50
2019-07-02SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-25SenateSigned in House
2019-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-03SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-05-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-06SenateSecond consideration
2019-04-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-30SenateReported as committed
2019-03-29SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-03-26SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-03-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-25HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-13HouseReported as amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=547
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0547&pn=0538
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0547&pn=0886
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=117
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=118
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=119
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=125
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=199
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=125
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=183

Bill Comments

feedback