PA HB548 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) and 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in mayor, further providing for president or vice president of council to act as mayor; in taxation and finance, further providing for tax levy and for tax ordinance; in ordinances, further providing for ordinances and resolutions, for enactment, approval and veto, for recording, advertising and proof and for codification of ordinances; in council, further providing for ordinances and resolutions, for journal of proceedings, recording and withholding of vote, for records of ordinances maintained by city clerk and for time ordinances go into effect; and, in taxation, further providing for tax levies.
Title
In mayor, further providing for president or vice president of council to act as mayor; in taxation and finance, further providing for tax levy and for tax ordinance; in ordinances, further providing for ordinances and resolutions, for enactment, approval and veto, for recording, advertising and proof and for codification of ordinances; in council, further providing for ordinances and resolutions, for journal of proceedings, recording and withholding of vote, for records of ordinances maintained by city clerk and for time ordinances go into effect; and, in taxation, further providing for tax levies.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Emrick [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Rep. Kurt Masser [R] | Rep. Justin Simmons [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 548 PN 887, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor: HB 548 PN 887, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00167 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00166 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00277 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00177 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00100 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor: HB 548 PN 887, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00167 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00166 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00277 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00177 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00100 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 51 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-1) |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-25 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |