PA HB596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for a detoxification and addiction treatment bed registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a detoxification and addiction treatment bed registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 596 PN 642, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-05HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-04HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as committed
2019-03-01HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback