PA HB619 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the annual designation and holiday observance June 19 as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in this Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the annual designation and holiday observance June 19 as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in this Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 619 PN 614, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 619 PN 614, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateAct No. 9
2019-06-19SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-17SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-17SenateSigned in House
2019-06-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-05SenateReported as committed
2019-05-17SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-05-06SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2019-05-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-01HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as committed
2019-02-28HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=619
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0619&pn=0614
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/16/2019&RollCallId=301
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=257
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=441
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=229
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=283
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=118

Bill Comments

feedback