PA HB630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in military leave of absence, further providing for employment discrimination for military membership or duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In military leave of absence, further providing for employment discrimination for military membership or duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 630 PN 625, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-06-03SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2019-06-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-15HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-14HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-08HouseReported as committed
2019-02-28HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback