PA HB632 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in certificate of title and security interests, further providing for application for certificate of title by agent; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for odometer disclosure requirements.
Title
In certificate of title and security interests, further providing for application for certificate of title by agent; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for odometer disclosure requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D] |
Rep. Christopher Rabb [D] | Rep. Rich Irvin [R] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Rep. Malcolm Kenyatta [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 632 PN 4052, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 632 PN 4052, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 632 PN 4052, A6509, LAUGHLIN AMENDMENT NO. A-6509 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 632 PN 1739, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 632 PN 627, 2019 A950, CARROLL (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 632 PN 4052, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 632 PN 4052, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 632 PN 4052, A6509, LAUGHLIN AMENDMENT NO. A-6509 (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 632 PN 1739, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 632 PN 627, 2019 A950, CARROLL (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Act No. 64 |
2020-07-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-07-07 | House | Signed in House |
2020-07-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-06-30 | House | In the House |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2019-05-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-06 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |