PA HB634 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic and providing for drivers in organized motorcycle processions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for following too closely.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic and providing for drivers in organized motorcycle processions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for following too closely.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 634 PN 1493, FP (Y: 172 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 634 PN 1376, 2019 A789, NEILSON (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00658 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-04-29SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (172-23)
2019-04-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-10HouseReported as amended
2019-02-28HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=634
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0634&pn=0629
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0634&pn=1376
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0634&pn=1493
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=201
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=352
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=210
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=373

Bill Comments

feedback