PA HB66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Peg Run Road, Pennsylvania Route 240, over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Susquehanna Township, Cambria County, as the United States Army Sergeant Scott O. Henry Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of Peg Run Road, Pennsylvania Route 240, over the West Branch of the Susquehanna River, Susquehanna Township, Cambria County, as the United States Army Sergeant Scott O. Henry Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 66 PN 542, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00079 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-03-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-21HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-19HouseReported as amended
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=66
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0066&pn=0070
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0066&pn=0542
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=52
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=53
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=74
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=106

Bill Comments

feedback