PA HB672 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 13, 1970 (P.L.19, No.10), entitled "An act enabling certain minors to consent to medical, dental and health services, declaring consent unnecessary under certain circumstances," further providing for mental health treatment and for release of medical records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of February 13, 1970 (P.L.19, No.10), entitled "An act enabling certain minors to consent to medical, dental and health services, declaring consent unnecessary under certain circumstances," further providing for mental health treatment and for release of medical records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 672 PN 2004, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 672 PN 1813, 2019 A1609, STEPHENS (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 672 PN 1813, 2019 A1465, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01270 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A01330 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-03HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as amended
2019-03-01HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=672
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0672&pn=0685
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0672&pn=1813
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0672&pn=2004
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=510
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=516
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=639

Bill Comments

feedback