PA HB69 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 28, 1984 (P.L.150, No.28), known as the Automobile Lemon Law, further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 69 PN 45, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 69 PN 45, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2021-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-19 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |