PA HB706 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for returns of married individuals, deceased or disabled individuals and fiduciaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for returns of married individuals, deceased or disabled individuals and fiduciaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 706 PN 1435, FP (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 706 PN 731, 2019 A529, GREINER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-04-16SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-3)
2019-04-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-27HouseReported as committed
2019-03-05HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=706
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0706&pn=0731
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0706&pn=1435
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=222
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=180
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=193
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/16/2019&RollCallId=284

Bill Comments

feedback