PA HB71 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 6, 1951 (P.L.69, No.20), known as The Landlord and Tenant Act of 1951, in recovery of possession, further providing for hearing, judgment, writ of possession and payment of rent by tenant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In recovery of possession, further providing for hearing, judgment, writ of possession and payment of rent by tenant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback