PA HB730 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-14)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of September 9, 1965 (P.L.497, No.251), known as the Newborn Child Testing Act, further providing for definitions and for Newborn Child Screening and Follow-up Program; and providing for Newborn Child Screening Program Account, for newborn child screening fee and for mandated screening and follow-up.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for Newborn Child Screening and Follow-up Program; and providing for Newborn Child Screening Program Account, for newborn child screening fee and for mandated screening and follow-up.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-18 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-09HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-18HouseReported as committed
2019-04-15HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback