PA HB751 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties, further providing for power of commission to order acquisition of small water and sewer utilities; in procedure on complaints, further providing for service of complaints on parties; and, in rates and distribution systems, further providing for computation of income tax expense for ratemaking purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties, further providing for power of commission to order acquisition of small water and sewer utilities; in procedure on complaints, further providing for service of complaints on parties; and, in rates and distribution systems, further providing for computation of income tax expense for ratemaking purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 751 PN 876, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 751 PN 876, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00175 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02SenateAct No. 53
2019-07-02SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-25SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-25SenateSigned in House
2019-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-17SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-12SenateReported as committed
2019-03-28SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-03-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-03-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-18HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-12HouseReported as amended
2019-03-08HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=751
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0751&pn=0801
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0751&pn=0876
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=88
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=87
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=95
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=148
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=306
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=369
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=169

Bill Comments

feedback