PA HB752 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in property and buildings, further providing for price paid for acquisitions and improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In property and buildings, further providing for price paid for acquisitions and improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 752 PN 802, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2019-03-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2019-03-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-12HouseReported as committed
2019-03-08HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback